AL SB233 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Assigned Act No. 2016-110.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sales and use tax, simplified seller use tax remittance, definition of seller, continued participation if physical address established, Secs. 40-23-191, 40-23-198 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax, simplified seller use tax remittance, definition of seller, continued participation if physical address established, Secs. 40-23-191, 40-23-198 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-17SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-110.
2016-03-17HouseSignature Requested
2016-03-17SenateEnrolled
2016-03-17SenatePassed Second House
2016-03-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 302
2016-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-03-10HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2016-02-25SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 216
2016-02-25SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-02-24SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback