AL SB232 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to motor vehicles; establishing the Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Program Act; to provide for the operation of peer-to-peer car sharing programs in the state; and to amend Section 40-12-222, Code of Alabama 1975, to exclude lessors of peer-to-peer car sharing vehicles from liability for certain taxes on the proceeds of vehicle rental and leasing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to motor vehicles; establishing the Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Program Act; to provide for the operation of peer-to-peer car sharing programs in the state; and to amend Section 40-12-222, Code of Alabama 1975, to exclude lessors of peer-to-peer car sharing vehicles from liability for certain taxes on the proceeds of vehicle rental and leasing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31SenateIndefinitely Postpone
2023-05-24SenateRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-05-25SenateRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-05-24SenateReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-05-24SenateReported Favorably
2023-05-24SenateReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-05-24SenateReported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
2023-05-24SenateAmendment/Substitute by Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund UR68DG-1
2023-05-24SenateAmendment/Substitute by Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund 79S12E-1
2023-04-20SenateIntroduced and Referred to Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
2023-04-20SenateRead First Time in House of Origin

Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback