AL SB232 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure, to further provide for pretrial supervision of certain offenders by a community punishment and corrections program as a condition of his or her bond in certain circumstances
Title
Criminal procedure, to further provide for pretrial supervision of certain offenders by a community punishment and corrections program as a condition of his or her bond in certain circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 815 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 814 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 814 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund |
2022-04-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 815 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 26 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 26 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |