AL SB232 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Public Safety and Homeland Security second Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dogs, dangerous defined, procedure and hearing provided to determine if dangerous, registration, penalties, liability of owner, Emily's Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dogs, dangerous defined, procedure and hearing provided to determine if dangerous, registration, penalties, liability of owner, Emily's Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Livingston motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Smith motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security second Amendment Offered
2018-03-01SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-182.
2018-03-01HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-01HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-01SenateEnrolled
2018-03-01SenateLivingston motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 540
2018-03-01SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-02-27HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 528
2018-02-27HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 527
2018-02-27HouseBoothe Amendment Offered
2018-02-27HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 526
2018-02-27HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security #2 Amendment Offered
2018-02-27HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 525
2018-02-27HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
2018-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2018-02-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2018-02-15SenateEngrossed
2018-02-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 421
2018-02-15SenateLivingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 420
2018-02-15SenateLivingston Amendment Offered
2018-02-15SenateWilliams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 419
2018-02-15SenateWilliams Amendment Offered
2018-02-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-13SenateLivingston motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-13SenateSmith motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 401
2018-02-13SenateSmith Amendment Offered
2018-02-13SenateLivingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 400
2018-02-13SenateLivingston first Substitute Offered
2018-02-13SenateLivingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 399
2018-02-13SenateAgriculture, Conservation, and Forestry Amendment Offered
2018-02-13SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-02-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB232&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB232-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB232-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB232-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190677-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191591-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191627-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191634-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191742-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192005-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191883-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192358-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=587859&VOTE=399&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=587861&VOTE=400&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=587867&VOTE=401&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=588465&VOTE=419&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=588467&VOTE=420&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=588468&VOTE=421&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591194&VOTE=525&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591196&VOTE=526&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591200&VOTE=527&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591201&VOTE=528&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591379&VOTE=540&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback