AL SB232 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-480.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-480.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General contractor regulation, exemptions for residence and private dwellings may not be restricted by municipal governing or regulatory bodies, Sec. 34-8-7 am'd.
Title
General contractor regulation, exemptions for residence and private dwellings may not be restricted by municipal governing or regulatory bodies, Sec. 34-8-7 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Wood motion to Table (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Wood motion to Table (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-480. |
2015-06-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-06-04 | House | Pringle filed Conflict of Interest Declaration |
2015-06-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1352 |
2015-06-04 | House | Wood motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1351 |
2015-06-04 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 301 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |