AL SB231 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Agriculture and Forestry with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Dogs, used for agricultural work, exempt from local leash laws, exception

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dogs, used for agricultural work, exempt from local leash laws, exception

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Glover motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Ross motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HousePending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Agriculture and Forestry with 1 amendment
2017-05-18HouseAgriculture and Forestry first Amendment Offered
2017-05-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-05-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2017-05-11SenateEngrossed
2017-05-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 989
2017-05-09SenateGlover motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 988
2017-05-09SenateGlover Amendment Offered
2017-05-09SenateRoss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 987
2017-05-09SenateRoss Amendment Offered
2017-05-09SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-09SenateDial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-09SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-02-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-21SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB231&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB231-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB231-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186726-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185035-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186780-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=575508&VOTE=987&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=575510&VOTE=988&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=575511&VOTE=989&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback