AL SB230 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Committee in Second House to House State Government
Hearing: May 1 @ 3:00 pm in Room 206
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Committee in Second House to House State Government
Hearing: May 1 @ 3:00 pm in Room 206
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Geologic storage, completion certificate and its implications, funds to manage open and closed reservoirs, pore space possession, leasing state land as these relate to carbon dioxide provided.
Title
Geologic storage, completion certificate and its implications, funds to manage open and closed reservoirs, pore space possession, leasing state land as these relate to carbon dioxide provided.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 552 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt - Roll Call 551 DFKVTHT-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt - Roll Call 551 DFKVTHT-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Re-referred to Committee in Second House to House State Government |
2024-04-18 | House | Pending House Agriculture and Forestry |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 552 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Albritton motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 551 DFKVTHT-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Albritton 1st Amendment Offered DFKVTHT-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Albritton motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote NQWVJJ8-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund 1st Amendment Offered NQWVJJ8-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund 1st Amendment NQWVJJ8-1 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
Same As/Similar To
HB327 (Same As) 2024-04-16 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar