AL SB23 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-404.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Employee's Retirement System, active members, reopening of service credits for certain employees of local agencies or organizations, qualification that employee had to be employed prior to Oct. 1, 2000, removed, Sec. 36-27-70 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employee's Retirement System, active members, reopening of service credits for certain employees of local agencies or organizations, qualification that employee had to be employed prior to Oct. 1, 2000, removed, Sec. 36-27-70 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 24 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-404.
2018-03-22SenateDelivered to Governor at 12:00 p.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22SenateEnrolled
2018-03-22HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-22SenatePassed Second House
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 997
2018-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2018-01-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 203
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback