AL SB23 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Assigned Act No. 2015-506.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, National Guard tags, exemption applicable to other plates, insurance, evidence by electronic format, Revenue Department authorized to send notices in electronic format, Sec. 32-7A-26 added; Secs. 31-2-12, 32-6-110, 32-7A-6, 40-12-244 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, National Guard tags, exemption applicable to other plates, insurance, evidence by electronic format, Revenue Department authorized to send notices in electronic format, Sec. 32-7A-26 added; Secs. 31-2-12, 32-6-110, 32-7A-6, 40-12-244 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-07SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-506.
2015-08-07HouseSignature Requested
2015-08-07SenateEnrolled
2015-08-07SenatePassed Second House
2015-08-07HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 41
2015-08-07HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2015-08-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 33
2015-08-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-04SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback