AL SB229 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-439.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-439.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Chambers Co., boards of registrars, working days increased to 180 days, Sec. 17-3-8 am'd.
Title
Chambers Co., boards of registrars, working days increased to 180 days, Sec. 17-3-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-439. |
2019-05-31 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1242 |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 343 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |