AL SB229 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Neighborhood Infrastructure Authorities, municipalities, assessments for neighborhood infrastructure revitalization projects, income tax credits, expiration date deleted, Secs. 11-71-11, 11-71-12 am'd.
Title
Neighborhood Infrastructure Authorities, municipalities, assessments for neighborhood infrastructure revitalization projects, income tax credits, expiration date deleted, Secs. 11-71-11, 11-71-12 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 amendment |
2017-05-09 | House | Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered |
2017-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 469 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 468 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |