AL SB229 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Education Policy first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Education Policy first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Virtual education, program open to resident students and past residents who are military dependents, distribution of state and federal funds clarified, Act 2015-89, 2015 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 16-46A-2 am'd.
Title
Virtual education, program open to resident students and past residents who are military dependents, distribution of state and federal funds clarified, Act 2015-89, 2015 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 16-46A-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt Committee Substitute (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Rules Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt Committee Substitute (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Rules Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Education Policy first Substitute Offered |
2016-03-17 | House | Education Policy second Amendment Offered |
2016-03-17 | House | Education Policy first Amendment Offered |
2016-03-17 | House | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Education Policy with 1 substitute and 2 amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2016-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 2 amendments |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 431 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Brewbaker motion to Adopt Committee Substitute adopted Roll Call 430 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Brewbaker motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 429 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Rules Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 428 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Education and Youth Affairs Amendment to Committee Substitute Offered |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Education and Youth Affairs Substitute Offered |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Brewbaker motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Education and Youth Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |