AL SB229 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2014-181.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2014-181.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Trapping of fur-bearing animals, licensing by Conservation and Natural Resources Department, fees, use of plastic tags on traps and the requirement that the license number of the owner of a trap be contained on any tag, deleted, Sec. 9-11-59 am'd.
Title
Trapping of fur-bearing animals, licensing by Conservation and Natural Resources Department, fees, use of plastic tags on traps and the requirement that the license number of the owner of a trap be contained on any tag, deleted, Sec. 9-11-59 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-181. |
2014-03-13 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-03-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 701 |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 235 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |