AL SB227 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2012 at 11:23 a.m. on May 9, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Catastrophe savings account, established, to cover insurance deductibles and other uninsured portions of risks of loss to owners of residential property owners from windstorm events, income tax deduction for deposits made to account

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Catastrophe savings account, established, to cover insurance deductibles and other uninsured portions of risks of loss to owners of residential property owners from windstorm events, income tax deduction for deposits made to account

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-10 - Senate - Brooks motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-09 Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2012 at 11:23 a.m. on May 9, 2012
2012-05-09 Assigned Act No. 2012-413.
2012-05-09 Enrolled
2012-05-09 Signature Requested
2012-05-09 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2012-05-08 Brooks motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1205
2012-05-08 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-08 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1316
2012-05-08 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1315
2012-05-08 Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered
2012-05-08 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-02 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-04-24 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2012-04-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 734
2012-04-24 Third Reading Passed
2012-02-16 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-07 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB227
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB227-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB227-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=440474&VOTE=734&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=445725&VOTE=1315&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=445735&VOTE=1316&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=446600&VOTE=1205&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback