AL SB226 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substances, additional compounds included in Schedule I, Sec. 20-2-23 am'd.
Title
Controlled substances, additional compounds included in Schedule I, Sec. 20-2-23 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 59 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-279. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 892 |
2016-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-05-04 | House | Butler motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2016-05-04 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-04-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-26 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 820 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 819 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary as Favorable with 1 amendment |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |