AL SB225 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-502.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Hemp, require state to seek federal approval of state program regulating hemp production, deschedule THC derived from hemp as a controlled substance, Secs. 2-8-381, 2-8-383, 20-2-2, 20-2-23 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hemp, require state to seek federal approval of state program regulating hemp production, deschedule THC derived from hemp as a controlled substance, Secs. 2-8-381, 2-8-383, 20-2-2, 20-2-23 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-502.
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled
2019-05-30HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-30SenatePassed Second House
2019-05-29HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1152
2019-05-29HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-21HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-16HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2019-05-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 863
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback