AL SB225 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy, State Board of, inspectors renamed investigators, maximum fees increased, frequency of drug supply chain registration increased, further regulation of entities within drug supply chain provided, resale of compound drug products prohibited, Sec. 34-23-32.2 added; Secs. 34-23-152 to 34-23-157, inclusive, repealed; Secs. 20-2-9, 20-2-190, 34-23-1, 34-23-3, 34-23-9, 34-23-30, 34-23-32, 34-23-32.1, 34-23-33, 34-23-70, 34-23-92, 34-23-131, 34-23-159, 34-23-160, 34-23-162 am'd
Title
Pharmacy, State Board of, inspectors renamed investigators, maximum fees increased, frequency of drug supply chain registration increased, further regulation of entities within drug supply chain provided, resale of compound drug products prohibited, Sec. 34-23-32.2 added; Secs. 34-23-152 to 34-23-157, inclusive, repealed; Secs. 20-2-9, 20-2-190, 34-23-1, 34-23-3, 34-23-9, 34-23-30, 34-23-32, 34-23-32.1, 34-23-33, 34-23-70, 34-23-92, 34-23-131, 34-23-159, 34-23-160, 34-23-162 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Beasley motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Beasley motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Health |
2017-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 558 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Beasley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 557 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Health and Human Services first Substitute Offered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |