AL SB224 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to crimes and offenses; to amend Section 13A-6-111, Code of Alabama 1975, to provide for the age of a child for the crime of transmitting obscene material to a child by computer; to amend Section 13A-6-240, Code of Alabama 1975, to establish jurisdiction for a violation of distributing a private image; to amend Section 13A-13-3, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for the crime of incest; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to crimes and offenses; to amend Section 13A-6-111, Code of Alabama 1975, to provide for the age of a child for the crime of transmitting obscene material to a child by computer; to amend Section 13A-6-240, Code of Alabama 1975, to establish jurisdiction for a violation of distributing a private image; to amend Section 13A-13-3, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for the crime of incest; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-31 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Adopt CETMJW-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Adopt LPXNYA-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Adopt M5TKWH-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01SenateEnacted
2023-06-01SenateEnrolled
2023-05-31SenateConcur In and Adopt
2023-05-31HouseRead a Third Time and Pass as Amended
2023-05-31HouseAdopt CETMJW-1
2023-05-31HouseOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-24HouseRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-24HouseReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-24HouseReported Favorably from House Judiciary
2023-05-16HouseReferred to Committee to House Judiciary
2023-05-16SenateRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-16SenateRead A Third Time And Passed As Amended
2023-05-16SenateAdopt LPXNYA-1
2023-05-16SenateAdopt M5TKWH-1
2023-05-16SenateOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-05-11SenateRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-05-10SenateReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-05-10SenateReported Favorably from Senate Judiciary
2023-04-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to Senate Judiciary
2023-04-19SenateRead First Time in House of Origin

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/SB224-int.pdf
Texthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/SB224-eng.pdf
Texthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/SB224-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/LPXNYA-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/M5TKWH-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/CETMJW-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-IP8FZZ-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-IP8FZZ-2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc780
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc781
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc782
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1077
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1078
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1172

Bill Comments

feedback