AL SB222 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Assigned Act No. 2022-265.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Assigned Act No. 2022-265.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Landscape Architects, Board of Examiners of, use of the landscape architect title, by individuals and certain business entities, Secs. 34-17-4, 34-17-7, 34-17-24, 34-17-25 am'd.
Title
Landscape Architects, Board of Examiners of, use of the landscape architect title, by individuals and certain business entities, Secs. 34-17-4, 34-17-7, 34-17-24, 34-17-25 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 785 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - HBIR: Moore (P) motion to Adopt Roll Call 784 (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 549 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt Roll Call 548 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 547 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - HBIR: Moore (P) motion to Adopt Roll Call 784 (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 549 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt Roll Call 548 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 547 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-265. |
2022-03-31 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 785 |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 549 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 548 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Givhan Amendment Offered |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB348 (Same As) 2022-03-30 - Moore (P) motion to SB222 Substitute FOR HB348 a Companion Bill adopted Voice Vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 17 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 17 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 17 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 17 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |