AL SB222 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

County Superintendent of Education, required to be appointed unless provided otherwise by constitution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Superintendent of Education, required to be appointed unless provided otherwise by constitution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - Rowe motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 41 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - South motion to Carry Over to Day Certain (Y: 35 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseFurther Consideration
2019-05-31HouseRowe motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Roll Call 1280
2019-05-31HouseSouth motion to Carry Over to Day Certain lost Roll Call 1279
2019-05-31HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2019-04-11HouseReported from Education Policy as Favorable
2019-04-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2019-04-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 170
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-04SenateButler motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-04-04SenateButler motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-04-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback