AL SB221 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Assigned Act No. 2022-155.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Assigned Act No. 2022-155.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Class 6 municipality, with staggered terms, mayor and council terms revised and extended
Title
Class 6 municipality, with staggered terms, mayor and council terms revised and extended
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 555 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-10 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 554 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 413 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 412 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 554 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 413 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 412 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-155. |
2022-03-10 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 555 |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 413 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation |