AL SB221 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, Driver's licenses, examination, drowsy driving, requirement that permit manual and State Dept. of Edu. driver's edcuation courses include
Title
Motor vehicles, Driver's licenses, examination, drowsy driving, requirement that permit manual and State Dept. of Edu. driver's edcuation courses include
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2017-04-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 420 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 419 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable with 1 amendment |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |