AL SB221 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 2:05 p.m. on April 14, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 2:05 p.m. on April 14, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coosa Co., water systems, private, water furnished by municipality, regulated by municipality rather than Public Service Commission
Title
Coosa Co., water systems, private, water furnished by municipality, regulated by municipality rather than Public Service Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 48) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 2:05 p.m. on April 14, 2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2011-150. | |
2011-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2011-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2011-04-14 | Passed Second House | |
2011-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 260 | |
2011-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2011-03-31 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 136 | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |