AL SB22 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Assigned Act No. 2022-39.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Assigned Act No. 2022-39.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, retail table wine licensee, off-premises sale of approved containers, provided for, Sec. 28-3A-15 am'd.
Title
Alcoholic beverages, retail table wine licensee, off-premises sale of approved containers, provided for, Sec. 28-3A-15 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 152 (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - HBIR: Isbell motion to Adopt Roll Call 151 (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 78 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 77 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - HBIR: Isbell motion to Adopt Roll Call 151 (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 78 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 77 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-39. |
2022-02-16 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-02-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 152 |
2022-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 78 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism |
Same As/Similar To
HB149 (Same As) 2022-02-09 - Pending third reading on day 9 Favorable from Tourism