AL SB22 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2018-260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Education, personnel vacancies, posting of on local bd. of ed. website, at a minimum, or at each school campus and worksite, time to post decreased from 14 to 7 days before position to be filled, Sec. 16-22-15 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, personnel vacancies, posting of on local bd. of ed. website, at a minimum, or at each school campus and worksite, time to post decreased from 14 to 7 days before position to be filled, Sec. 16-22-15 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-260.
2018-03-13HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-13SenateEnrolled
2018-03-08HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-08SenateBrewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 757
2018-03-08SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-08HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 655
2018-03-08HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 654
2018-03-08HouseEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-25HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2018-01-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 79
2018-01-23SenateBrewbaker motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 78
2018-01-25SenateEngrossed
2018-01-23SenateEducation and Youth Affairs Amendment Offered
2018-01-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB22&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB22-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189886-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=582491&VOTE=78&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=582499&VOTE=79&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=594199&VOTE=654&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=594200&VOTE=655&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=594505&VOTE=757&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback