AL SB22 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credits, increase for rural physicians and dentists, Secs. 40-18-130 to 40-18-132, inclusive, am'd.
Title
Income tax credits, increase for rural physicians and dentists, Secs. 40-18-130 to 40-18-132, inclusive, am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Ways and Means Education |
2017-05-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 538 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 537 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |