AL SB219 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Vulnerable Child Compassion and Protection Act, prohibits gender change therapy for minors, prohibits withholding of certain related information from parents

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vulnerable Child Compassion and Protection Act, prohibits gender change therapy for minors, prohibits withholding of certain related information from parents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Beasley motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2020-03-10SenateEngrossed
2020-03-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 319
2020-03-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2020-03-05SenateShelnutt motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2020-03-05SenateBeasley motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 303
2020-03-05SenateBeasley Amendment Offered
2020-03-05SenateShelnutt motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 302
2020-03-05SenateHealthcare Amendment Offered
2020-03-05SenateThird Reading
2020-02-27SenateReported from Healthcare as Favorable with 1 amendment
2020-02-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB219&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/SB219-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/SB219-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/205713-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/205713-3.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=634879&VOTE=303&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=634880&VOTE=302&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=634960&VOTE=319&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback