AL SB219 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2016-111.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2016-111.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, permit a retail licensee and state liquor store to conduct distilled liquor and wine tastings, Sec. 28-3A-25 am'd.
Title
Alcoholic beverages, permit a retail licensee and state liquor store to conduct distilled liquor and wine tastings, Sec. 28-3A-25 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-111. |
2016-03-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 327 |
2016-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 193 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing |