AL SB219 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Labor, child labor law enforcement, Sec. 25-8-59 am'd.
Title
Labor, child labor law enforcement, Sec. 25-8-59 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from State Government |
2015-05-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 738 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |