AL SB218 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-391.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-391.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities, police jurisdiction, not to extend in additional territory after effective date of this act without affirmative vote of municipal council, Sec. 11-40-10 am'd.
Title
Municipalities, police jurisdiction, not to extend in additional territory after effective date of this act without affirmative vote of municipal council, Sec. 11-40-10 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 77 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Hill (M) motion to Table (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Hill (M) motion to Table (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-391. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 910 |
2016-05-04 | House | Hill (M) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 909 |
2016-05-04 | House | CMG first Substitute Offered |
2016-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-05-04 | House | Hill (M) motion to Suspend Rules adopted Voice Vote |
2016-05-04 | House | Motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2016-05-04 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-05-04 | House | Hill (M) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2016-05-04 | House | County and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered |
2016-05-04 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-04-19 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2016-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 388 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 387 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government |