AL SB216 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned Act No. 2019-187.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned Act No. 2019-187.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Judicial Article of Constitution of Alabama revised, vacancies in the office of a judge, procedure further provided, age restriction on judicial office, increased, judicial discipline further provided, Judicial Inquiry Commission, membership further provided, impeachment of justices of supreme court deleted, Administrative Director of Courts, appointed further provided, const. amend.
Title
Judicial Article of Constitution of Alabama revised, vacancies in the office of a judge, procedure further provided, age restriction on judicial office, increased, judicial discipline further provided, Judicial Inquiry Commission, membership further provided, impeachment of justices of supreme court deleted, Administrative Director of Courts, appointed further provided, const. amend.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-187. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 677 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 676 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-14 | House | Hill Amendment Offered |
2019-05-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 431 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 430 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |