AL SB216 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-441.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State agencies, fees levied which are retained to fund agency, increases based on Consumer Price Index authorized to be adopted by rule, periodic fees thereafter every five years

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State agencies, fees levied which are retained to fund agency, increases based on Consumer Price Index authorized to be adopted by rule, periodic fees thereafter every five years

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - Senate - Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-441.
2015-06-04SenateEnrolled
2015-06-04HouseSignature Requested
2015-06-04HouseMoore (B) intended to vote "Nay"
2015-06-04HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2015-06-04SenateDial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1422
2015-06-04SenateConcurrence Requested
2015-06-03HouseMooney inadvertenly voted Yea and intended to vote Nay
2015-06-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1259
2015-06-03HouseHolmes (A) motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Voice Vote
2015-06-03HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1258
2015-06-03HouseWays and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2015-06-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-06-02HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-05-28HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2015-05-28SenateEngrossed
2015-05-28SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1259
2015-05-28SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1258
2015-05-28SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2015-05-28SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-05-26SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-03-12SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB216
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB216-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB216-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB216-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=523191&VOTE=1258&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=523192&VOTE=1259&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=525534&VOTE=1258&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=525570&VOTE=1259&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=525872&VOTE=1422&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback