AL SB216 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Assigned Act No. 2014-134.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Assigned Act No. 2014-134.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations, supplemental for fiscal year ending September 2014, transfer of funds from certain funds, transfer of funds from Attorney General to Office of Prosecution Services and use of funds from National Mortgage Settlement further provided
Title
Appropriations, supplemental for fiscal year ending September 2014, transfer of funds from certain funds, transfer of funds from Attorney General to Office of Prosecution Services and use of funds from National Mortgage Settlement further provided
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2014-134. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-02-27 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 562 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2014-02-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 428 |
2014-02-26 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 427 |
2014-02-26 | House | Wren Amendment Offered |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 366 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 365 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Roll Call 364 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Taxation General Fund as Favorable with 1 amendment |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |