AL SB215 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-355.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-355.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Employees' Retirement System, retirees, one-time lump-sum additional payment
Title
Employees' Retirement System, retirees, one-time lump-sum additional payment
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-355. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-15 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-03-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 808 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 734 |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 733 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rich Amendment Offered |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 732 |
2018-03-13 | House | Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2018-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 509 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 508 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Dial first Substitute Offered |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |