AL SB215 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned Act No. 2016-166.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned Act No. 2016-166.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School buses, automated civil enforcement of school bus violations, county and city boards of education may initiate and enforce, district and municipal courts, county and city law enforcement
Title
School buses, automated civil enforcement of school bus violations, county and city boards of education may initiate and enforce, district and municipal courts, county and city law enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Holley motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 12 N: 72 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 12 N: 72 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-166. |
2016-04-19 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Holley motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 672 |
2016-04-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 606 |
2016-04-13 | House | Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 605 |
2016-04-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 604 |
2016-04-13 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 287 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 286 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 285 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |