AL SB215 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 11:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 11:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational Therapy, definition of occupational therapy, expand referrals for treatment, certain occupational therapists exempt from referral requirement, deletes requirement that Board of Medical Examiners jointly approve certain rules, executive director provided for, Secs. 34-39-3, 34-39-4, 34-39-5, 34-39-6, 34-39-7, 34-39-8, 34-39-11, 34-39-16 am'd.
Title
Occupational Therapy, definition of occupational therapy, expand referrals for treatment, certain occupational therapists exempt from referral requirement, deletes requirement that Board of Medical Examiners jointly approve certain rules, executive director provided for, Secs. 34-39-3, 34-39-4, 34-39-5, 34-39-6, 34-39-7, 34-39-8, 34-39-11, 34-39-16 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 11:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-309. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1166 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1250 |
2013-05-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1249 |
2013-05-20 | House | Health Amendment Offered |
2013-05-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 458 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 457 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Health Amendment Offered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |