AL SB214 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 11:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 11:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipality, Mayor/Council form of government, council meetings, cancellation for lack of quorum, procedures, Sec. 11-43-50 am'd
Title
Municipality, Mayor/Council form of government, council meetings, cancellation for lack of quorum, procedures, Sec. 11-43-50 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 11:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-308. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1248 |
2013-05-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 486 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |