AL SB213 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned Act No. 2019-224.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned Act No. 2019-224.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Genetic Counselor Act, Board of Genetic Counseling created to license genetic counselors, powers of board, qualifications for licensure, exemptions from licensure provided, funding, and penalties for violations
Title
Alabama Genetic Counselor Act, Board of Genetic Counseling created to license genetic counselors, powers of board, qualifications for licensure, exemptions from licensure provided, funding, and penalties for violations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-224. |
2019-05-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 702 |
2019-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 378 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 377 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Waggoner Amendment Offered |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 376 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 375 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 374 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Healthcare Amendment Offered |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Healthcare Amendment Offered |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Healthcare Amendment Offered |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |