AL SB213 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Asset forfeitures, criminal procedure, Forfeiture Database and Reporting Act, created

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Asset forfeitures, criminal procedure, Forfeiture Database and Reporting Act, created

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateEngrossed
2018-03-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 983
2018-03-21SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 982
2018-03-21SenateSmitherman Amendment Offered
2018-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-21SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-21SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 933
2018-03-21SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2018-03-21SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-03-20SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-20SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 893
2018-03-20SenateOrr first Substitute Offered
2018-03-20SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-02-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB213&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB213-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB213-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193556-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193678-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193793-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597937&VOTE=893&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598748&VOTE=933&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599165&VOTE=982&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599168&VOTE=983&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback