AL SB211 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Assigned Act No. 2021-322.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Assigned Act No. 2021-322.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Off-road vehicles, all-terrain vehicles (ATV's) and recreational off-road vehicles, registration with Ala. State Law Enforcement Agency, width and weight restrictions increased, Sec. 32-12A-1 am'd.
Title
Off-road vehicles, all-terrain vehicles (ATV's) and recreational off-road vehicles, registration with Ala. State Law Enforcement Agency, width and weight restrictions increased, Sec. 32-12A-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 934 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - HBIR: Moore (P) motion to Adopt Roll Call 933 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 326 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 325 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 324 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 323 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - HBIR: Moore (P) motion to Adopt Roll Call 933 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 326 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 325 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 324 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 323 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-322. |
2021-04-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 934 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 326 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 325 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 324 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB158 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security