AL SB210 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-440.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-440.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, wet-dry referendum, expands time during which elections may be held, Sec. 28-2-1 am'd.
Title
Alcoholic beverages, wet-dry referendum, expands time during which elections may be held, Sec. 28-2-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-440. |
2015-06-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-06-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1312 |
2015-06-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 556 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government |