AL SB21 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2022-157.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2022-157.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lineville, draft or keg beer, governing body may authorize sale
Title
Lineville, draft or keg beer, governing body may authorize sale
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 593 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 81 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - House - HBIR: Hurst motion to Adopt Roll Call 592 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 347 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 346 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - HBIR: Hurst motion to Adopt Roll Call 592 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 347 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 346 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-157. |
2022-03-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 593 |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 347 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |