AL SB21 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Assigned Act No. 2017-319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Assigned Act No. 2017-319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eyeglasses, over-the-counter eyeglasses, nonprescription glasses further defined, sale regulated, enforcement by district attorney or Attorney General
Title
Eyeglasses, over-the-counter eyeglasses, nonprescription glasses further defined, sale regulated, enforcement by district attorney or Attorney General
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-319. |
2017-05-16 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-05-16 | House | Morrow filed a Conflict of Interst Declaration |
2017-05-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 885 |
2017-05-16 | House | Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 884 |
2017-05-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 48 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Acted on by Health and Human Services as Favorable |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |