AL SB21 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-15 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Marriage, contract for, recording by judge of probate, transmission to Vital Statistics office, content of contract, Secs. 30-1-9, 30-1-10, 30-1-11, 30-1-14 repealed; Secs. 22-9A-17, 30-1-5, 30-1-12, 30-1-13, 30-1-16 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage, contract for, recording by judge of probate, transmission to Vital Statistics office, content of contract, Secs. 30-1-9, 30-1-10, 30-1-11, 30-1-14 repealed; Secs. 22-9A-17, 30-1-5, 30-1-12, 30-1-13, 30-1-16 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 36 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 76 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2015-09-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 60 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-09-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-09-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 57 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 63
2015-09-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 61
2015-09-15HouseJones Amendment Offered
2015-09-15HouseGaston motion to recess adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-15HouseMartin motion withdraw his amendement adopted vv
2015-09-15HouseMartin Amendment Offered
2015-09-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 60
2015-09-15HouseHill (J) Amendment Offered
2015-09-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 59
2015-09-15HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2015-09-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 58
2015-09-15HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2015-09-15HouseLost in second house
2015-09-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2015-09-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2015-09-11SenateEngrossed
2015-09-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 20
2015-09-11SenateAlbritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 19
2015-09-11SenateAlbritton Amendment Offered
2015-09-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-09-10SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB21
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015SS/PrintFiles/SB21-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531002&VOTE=19&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531003&VOTE=20&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531714&VOTE=58&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531716&VOTE=59&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531720&VOTE=60&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531764&VOTE=61&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531793&VOTE=63&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback