AL SB21 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Assigned Act No. 2015-340.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Assigned Act No. 2015-340.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Open Meetings Act, prohibit serial meetings, to clarify Open Meetings Act applies to meeting of the Legislature, committees, or subcommittees of governmental bodies, penalties, Secs. 36-25A-1, 36-25A-2, 36-25A-3, 36-25A-9 am'd.
Title
Alabama Open Meetings Act, prohibit serial meetings, to clarify Open Meetings Act applies to meeting of the Legislature, committees, or subcommittees of governmental bodies, penalties, Secs. 36-25A-1, 36-25A-2, 36-25A-3, 36-25A-9 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-340. |
2015-06-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-03 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Ward motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1319 |
2015-06-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1205 |
2015-06-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1204 |
2015-06-02 | House | Davis Amendment Offered |
2015-06-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1203 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-02 | House | Ethics and Campaign Finance first Substitute Offered |
2015-06-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-04-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 146 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 145 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hightower Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 144 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 143 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Ward Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 142 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |