AL SB209 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-549.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-549.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, tax credit for private intrastate adoptions, applicable to any private adoptions, Secs. 40-18-360, 40-18-361 am'd.
Title
Taxation, tax credit for private intrastate adoptions, applicable to any private adoptions, Secs. 40-18-360, 40-18-361 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-549. |
2018-03-27 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-27 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1166 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Brewbaker to Carry Over Adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1057 |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1056 |
2018-03-22 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2018-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 315 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |