AL SB209 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cosmetology and Barbering, Alabama Board of, schools of cosmetology and barbering, provide training programs above secondary level, Secs. 34-7B-1, 34-7B-26 am'd.
Title
Cosmetology and Barbering, Alabama Board of, schools of cosmetology and barbering, provide training programs above secondary level, Secs. 34-7B-1, 34-7B-26 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Further Consideration |
2015-05-07 | House | Beech motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-07 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2015-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 422 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |