AL SB209 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Prisoner Litigation Reform Act established, Montgomery County Circuit Court exclusive jurisdiction for all prisoners action, court guidelines established (2012-20522)
Title
Alabama Prisoner Litigation Reform Act established, Montgomery County Circuit Court exclusive jurisdiction for all prisoners action, court guidelines established (2012-20522)
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Judiciary first Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-08 | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-26 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 800 | |
2012-04-26 | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 799 | |
2012-04-26 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |