AL SB209 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on April 13, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2010, from various funds to various departments and agencies, distribution of Community Services Grants funds, 2010 General Appropriations Act, certain funding source changes from Capital Improvement Trust Fund to the State General Fund, Act 2009-550, 2009 Reg. Sess. am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2010, from various funds to various departments and agencies, distribution of Community Services Grants funds, 2010 General Appropriations Act, certain funding source changes from Capital Improvement Trust Fund to the State General Fund, Act 2009-550, 2009 Reg. Sess. am'd.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on April 13, 2010
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-609.
2010-04-22 Enacted with Line Item Veto
2010-04-13 Enrolled
2010-04-13 Signature Requested
2010-04-13 Concurred in Conference Report
2010-04-08 Knight motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 896
2010-04-08 Knight motion to Table Hill motion to nonconcur adopted Roll Call 895
2010-04-08 Hill motion to Nonconcur tabled
2010-04-08 Knight motion to Concur In and Adopt offered
2010-04-08 Motion in Writing adopted Roll Call 894
2010-04-08 Knight Motion in Writing offered to suspend Joint Rule 21
2010-04-08 SB209 Conference Report Concurrence Requested
2010-04-08 Conference Report
2010-04-06 Bedford motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 769
2010-04-06 Conference Committee on SB209 2010RS first Substitute Offered
2010-04-06 Conference Report
2010-04-06 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 768
2010-04-06 Bedford motion in writing to suspend Joint Rule 21
2010-03-23 Conference Committee Appointed
2010-03-23 Knight motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 645 House appoints Knight, Page and Gaston
2010-03-23 Conference Committee Requested
2010-03-11 Bedford motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 522 P&PO appoints Bedford, Little (Z) and Pittman
2010-03-11 Concurrence Requested
2010-03-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 532
2010-03-09 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 531
2010-03-09 Knight Amendment Offered
2010-03-09 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 530
2010-03-09 Government Appropriations first Substitute Offered
2010-03-09 Third Reading Passed
2010-03-03 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2010-02-16 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Appropriations
2010-02-16 Engrossed
2010-02-11 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 180
2010-02-11 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 179
2010-02-11 Barron Amendment Offered
2010-02-11 Third Reading Passed
2010-01-14 Reported from Finance and Taxation General Fund as Favorable
2010-01-12 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback