AL SB208 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-389.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-389.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax incentives, economic, state agency administered, report of cost to Legislature annually
Title
Tax incentives, economic, state agency administered, report of cost to Legislature annually
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-389. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 903 |
2016-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 391 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 390 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Orr first Substitute Offered |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |